Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/13/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/14/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/04/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/04/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/24/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/21/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/09/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/23/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/01/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/01/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/24/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/24/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/08/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/08/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/16/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/16/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/16/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/16/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 05/16/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/16/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/01/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/17/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/10/2012