Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/06/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/01/2012