Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/13/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/05/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/07/2012