Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/15/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/15/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/12/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/12/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/12/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/13/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/13/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/19/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/19/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/19/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/20/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/15/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/15/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/15/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/15/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 01/18/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/13/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/27/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/29/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/20/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/20/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/26/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/30/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/30/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/25/2012