Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/13/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/01/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/20/2012