Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/16/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/16/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/16/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/16/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/16/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/16/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/16/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/16/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/16/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/16/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/16/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/16/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/08/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/08/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/08/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/21/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/21/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/21/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/21/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 03/21/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/22/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/22/2012