Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/15/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/03/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/25/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/23/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/27/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/10/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/21/2012