Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/04/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/18/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/20/2012