Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/12/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/25/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/02/2012