Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 04/04/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 10/11/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/26/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/28/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/06/2012