Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/21/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2012