There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Water Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to clarify that fill material cannot be comprised of waste.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/05/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/06/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/05/2011Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/05/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/05/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/08/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/08/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/08/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/08/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/31/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/31/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/31/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/31/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/31/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/28/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/07/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/20/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/29/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/10/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/01/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/20/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/02/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/02/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/05/2011 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment04/06/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1375.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/05/2011)

Clean Water Protection Act - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to define "fill material" to mean any pollutant that replaces portions of waters of the United States with dry land or that changes the bottom elevation of a water body for any purpose and to exclude any pollutant discharged into the water primarily to dispose of waste.