Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/01/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2012