Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/12/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/24/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/13/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/27/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/01/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/20/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/23/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/23/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/31/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2012