Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-26 (08/03/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on July 21, 2011. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Restoring GI Bill Fairness Act of 2011 - Makes the amount payable for programs of education at nonpublic institutions of higher education pursued by individuals enrolled in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) post-9/11 educational assistance program (post-9/11 program) during the period beginning on August 1, 2011, and ending on July 31, 2014, the greater of $17,500, or the established charges payable under a VA maximum payments table published on October 27, 2010 (thereby preserving for such period the higher payment rates in effect prior to enactment of the Veterans Educational Assistance Improvements Act of 2010).

Extends through FY2012 VA authority to collect a fee from each individual obtaining an additional VA-guaranteed housing loan. Makes such loan fee: (1) 3.30% of the total amount guaranteed for loans made prior to October 1, 2011; and (2) 2.8% for FY2012 loans.