Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/13/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 05/13/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/13/2011