Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/04/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/22/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/16/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/31/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/29/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2012