Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/02/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/10/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/25/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/25/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/31/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/31/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/31/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/02/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/09/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/09/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/21/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/18/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/07/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/03/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/02/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/06/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 12/06/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/06/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/27/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/13/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/13/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/26/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/26/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/15/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/15/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/15/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/15/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/25/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/25/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 05/25/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/25/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/20/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/26/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/12/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/29/2012