Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/10/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/10/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/10/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/10/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/26/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/26/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/20/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/20/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/20/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/20/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/20/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/15/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/19/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/21/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/02/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/02/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/01/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/05/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/20/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/18/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/07/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/17/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/24/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/30/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 06/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/26/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2012