Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/13/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/25/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/25/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/20/2012