There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a comprehensive interagency response to reduce lung cancer mortality in a timely manner.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/06/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/18/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/15/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/06/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/22/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/04/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/31/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/31/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/31/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/29/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/29/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/29/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/30/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/31/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/12/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/12/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/12/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/09/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/09/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/09/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/09/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/09/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/09/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/09/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/09/2012

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce04/06/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/06/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services04/06/2011 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel05/18/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs04/06/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/15/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1394. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2011)

Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2011 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to implement a comprehensive program to achieve a 50% reduction in the mortality rate of lung cancer by 2020. Requires the program to include initiatives throughout HHS, including: (1) a strategic review and prioritization by the National Cancer Institute of research grants; (2) the establishment by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) of quality standards and guidelines for facilities that conduct computed tomography screening for lung cancer; and (3) the provision of funds to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to establish a Lung Cancer Early Detection Program that provides low-income, uninsured, and underserved populations that are at high risk for lung cancer access to early detection services.

Requires the Secretary of Defense (DOD) and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to coordinate with the Secretary of HHS in implementing this Act and implementing coordinated care programs for military personnel and veterans diagnosed with lung cancer.

Requires the Secretary of HHS to establish: (1) the Lung Cancer Computed Tomography Screening and Treatment Demonstration Project; and (2) the Lung Cancer Advisory Board to monitor the programs established under this Act.