Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/22/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/04/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/31/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/31/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/31/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/29/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/29/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/29/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/30/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/31/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/12/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/12/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/12/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/09/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/09/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/09/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/09/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/09/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/09/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/09/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/09/2012