Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/11/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/23/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/02/2012