Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/03/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/12/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/22/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/18/2012