Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/07/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/07/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/07/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/07/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/07/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/07/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/07/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/07/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/07/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/07/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/07/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/07/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/12/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/18/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/18/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/18/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/19/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/20/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/08/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/10/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/10/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/24/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/08/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/18/2012