There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Architect of the Capitol to establish battery recharging stations for privately owned vehicles in parking areas under the jurisdiction of the House of Representatives at no net cost to the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/16/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-170. (TXT | PDF)
08/16/2012 Signed by President.
08/07/2012 Presented to President.
08/02/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6007)
08/02/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/26/2012 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 112-625.
04/06/2011 Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/16/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-170. (TXT | PDF)
08/16/2012 Signed by President.
08/07/2012 House Presented to President.
08/03/2012 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2012 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6007)
08/02/2012-11:44am House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/02/2012-11:44am House On passage Passed without objection.
08/02/2012-11:44am House H.Amdt.1474 On agreeing to the Lungren, Daniel E. amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
08/02/2012-11:43am House H.Amdt.1474 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Lungren, Daniel E.. (consideration: CR H5650; text: CR H5650)
08/02/2012-11:43am House Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5650; text of measure as reported in House: CR H5650)
08/02/2012-11:42am House Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/26/2012 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449.
07/26/2012 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 112-625.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
07/19/2012 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
07/19/2012 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
04/06/2011 House Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
04/06/2011 House Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/06/2011 Referred to
07/19/2012 Markup by
07/26/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-625

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (9)

  • Appropriations
  • Congressional officers and employees
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • House of Representatives
  • Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
  • Transportation costs
  • U.S. Capitol
  • User charges and fees

Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1402. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-170 (08/16/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 26, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Makes funds appropriated to the Architect of the Capitol (AOC) for the Capitol power plant in any fiscal year available to construct, operate, and maintain on a reimbursable basis battery recharging stations in parking areas under the jurisdiction of the House of Representatives on Capitol grounds for use by privately owned vehicles used by: (1) Members of the House, or (2) employees whose pay is disbursed by the Chief Administrative Officer of the House or any other individuals authorized to park in any parking area under House jurisdiction on Capitol grounds (covered employees).

Requires the Architect to charge Members and covered employees fees for the electricity sufficient to cover costs, including those to any vendors or other costs associated with maintaining the battery recharging stations.

Requires the AOC to report triennially to the Committee on House Administration on whether or not individuals using the battery charging stations receive a subsidy from the taxpayers, and, if so, to submit a plan to the Committee to update the program to ensure that no subsidy is being received.

Requires the AOC, if the Committee fails to act on the plan within 60 days, to take appropriate steps to increase rates or fees to ensure reimbursement for the cost of the program.