Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/05/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/31/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/07/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/07/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/01/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/01/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/07/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/07/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/17/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/27/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/05/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/27/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/27/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/19/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/11/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/13/2012