Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/10/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/13/2011