Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/02/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/05/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/23/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/06/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/07/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/11/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/20/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/23/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/23/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/23/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/23/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/13/2012