Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/15/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/25/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/11/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/21/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/12/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/14/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/14/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/02/2012