Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/13/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/23/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/23/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/23/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/25/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/02/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/22/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/06/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/08/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/20/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/21/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/01/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/05/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 08/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/26/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/14/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/19/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/21/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/21/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/21/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/22/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/22/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/11/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/11/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/24/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/25/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/25/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/25/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/25/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/25/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/14/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/27/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/29/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/21/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/22/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/18/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/18/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/30/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/21/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/30/2012
Rep. Curson, David Alan [D-MI-11] 12/07/2012