Committees: H.R.1425 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology04/07/2011 Referred to
05/26/2011 Reported by House Report 112-90,Part 1
05/03/2011 Re-Referred to
05/04/2011 Markup by
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Technology and Innovation04/08/2011 Referred to
04/13/2011 Reported by
04/13/2011 Markup by
House Small Business04/07/2011 Referred to
07/01/2011 Reported by House Report 112-90,Part 2
05/03/2011 Re-Referred to
05/11/2011 Markup by
House Armed Services04/07/2011 Referred to
07/01/2011 Discharged from
05/03/2011 Re-Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities05/18/2011 Referred to