Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/07/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/07/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/07/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/07/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 01/12/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/10/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/31/2011