Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/24/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/11/2011