Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/13/2011