Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2012