Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/05/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/23/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/24/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/29/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/07/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/17/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/18/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/20/2012