Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 04/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/21/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/23/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2012