Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/03/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/22/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/14/2011