Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/14/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/25/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/08/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/08/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/01/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/24/2012