Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/14/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-264.
01/14/2013 Signed by President.
01/02/2013 Presented to President.
01/01/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7521)
12/28/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
12/28/2012 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/11/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5842-5843)
04/08/2011 Introduced in House