Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/19/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/19/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/19/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/08/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/05/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/31/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/07/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/07/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/15/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/15/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/27/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/28/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2012