Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/23/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/24/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/20/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/03/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/29/2012