Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/08/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/04/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/05/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/05/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/10/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/23/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/12/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/28/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/09/2011