Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 05/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/23/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/25/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/31/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/21/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/27/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/28/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/29/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/12/2012