Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/11/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/11/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/06/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/28/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/13/2012