Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/11/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/31/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/01/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/02/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/2012