Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/12/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/14/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/14/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/17/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/05/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/22/2012