Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/25/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/31/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/13/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/09/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/21/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/02/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/15/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/18/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/31/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/05/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/25/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/29/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/19/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/23/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/23/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 09/11/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/12/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/21/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/13/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/29/2012