Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/13/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/23/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/25/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/25/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/01/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/29/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/06/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/06/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/06/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2012